TN HB1855 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 672
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 672
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits the department and the state board of education from mandating assessments for any grades or subjects beyond those mandated during the 2016-2017 school year until the 2020-2021 school year. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 60.
Title
As enacted, prohibits the department and the state board of education from mandating assessments for any grades or subjects beyond those mandated during the 2016-2017 school year until the 2020-2021 school year. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 60.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Pub. Ch. 672 | |
2018-04-17 | Effective date(s) 04/12/2018 | |
2018-04-12 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-29 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-28 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0734) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-03-13 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-03-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-12 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-03-12 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0807) |
2018-03-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/12/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/8/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2018-02-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2018-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2018-01-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-24 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1806 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 672