TN HB1853 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, for the purposes of regulation of health and related facilities, exempts from the definition of "home health service" services provided by a person or entity that solely provides services of occupational and physical therapy or communication disorders and sciences by healthcare professionals if provided only on an outpatient basis; and therapy outpatient services provided by a person or entity under the social security act and reimbursed under medicare part B or a similar medicare advantage plan. - Amends TCA Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 63 and Title 68, relative to home therapy services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-04-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-02 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0814) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-03-26 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-03-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-25 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2024-03-25 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0715) |
2024-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1874 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-28 - Sponsor(s) Added.