TN HB1849 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 613
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 613
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing the confidentiality of records maintained by shelters, centers, and human trafficking service providers. - Amends TCA Section 10-7-504 and Section 36-3-623.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing the confidentiality of records maintained by shelters, centers, and human trafficking service providers. - Amends TCA Section 10-7-504 and Section 36-3-623.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 613 | |
2018-03-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-19 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/15/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2018-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-01-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-24 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1656 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 613