TN HB1846 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from $175,000 to $250,000 the first portion of home value for which property tax relief will be reimbursed to disabled veteran home owners. - Amends TCA Section 67-5-704.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 67-5-704, relative to tax relief for disabled veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2022-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1795 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee