TN HB1845 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 716
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 716
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes senators and representatives to decline appointment or appoint a designee to the board of the management corporation for a central business improvement district or inner-city redevelopment district and establishes requirement for person designated in place of the member; prohibits subsequent creation of a district for a period of one year if a petition fails to receive the requisite number of signatures. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 84, Part 5 and Title 7, Chapter 84, Part 6.
Title
As enacted, authorizes senators and representatives to decline appointment or appoint a designee to the board of the management corporation for a central business improvement district or inner-city redevelopment district and establishes requirement for person designated in place of the member; prohibits subsequent creation of a district for a period of one year if a petition fails to receive the requisite number of signatures. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 84, Part 5 and Title 7, Chapter 84, Part 6.
Sponsors
Rep. Robin Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 716 | |
2020-06-10 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-06-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/4/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2020-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1559 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 716