TN HB1835 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 587
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 587
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits the commissioner to grant an LEA a waiver of average class size limits to assist the LEA with funding a grow your own program. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 3; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, permits the commissioner to grant an LEA a waiver of average class size limits to assist the LEA with funding a grow your own program. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 3; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 587 | |
2020-03-09 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-03-05 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/9/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/5/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/18/2020 |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2020-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-01-23 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1790 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 587