TN HB1820 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 655
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises and expands provisions governing suspension of admissions to certain healthcare facilities under certain circumstances; revises other provisions governing healthcare facilities. - Amends TCA Title 63 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises and expands provisions governing suspension of admissions to certain healthcare facilities under certain circumstances; revises other provisions governing healthcare facilities. - Amends TCA Title 63 and Title 68.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 655
2018-03-22HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-22HouseComp. SB subst.
2018-03-20HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-15HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/22/2018
2018-03-14HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/15/2018
2018-03-13HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-03-07HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/13/2018
2018-03-07HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2018-02-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
2018-01-30HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2018-01-25HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2018-01-24HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-23HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2244 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 655

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback