TN SB2244 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 655
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises and expands provisions governing suspension of admissions to certain healthcare facilities under certain circumstances; revises other provisions governing healthcare facilities. - Amends TCA Title 63 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises and expands provisions governing suspension of admissions to certain healthcare facilities under certain circumstances; revises other provisions governing healthcare facilities. - Amends TCA Title 63 and Title 68.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-07 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11 Pub. Ch. 655
2018-04-11 Effective date(s) 07/01/2018
2018-04-09SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-04-02SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-03-29HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-03-28SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-03-22SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-03-22HousePassed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-03-22HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0851)
2018-03-22HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-03-22SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-03-22SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2018-03-22SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0732)
2018-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/22/2018
2018-03-19SenateSenate Reset on calendar 3/22/18
2018-03-16SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/19/2018
2018-03-07SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/7/2018
2018-02-28SenateAction deferred in Senate Health & Welfare Committee to 3/7/2018
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/28/2018
2018-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1820 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 655

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback