TN HB1789 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Effective date(s) 03/15/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Effective date(s) 03/15/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that pleas of guilt and nolo contendere to certain criminal offenses subject an educator to automatic revocation of an educator license by the state board; specifies that criminal offenses committed in another jurisdiction that are equivalent to those that if committed in this state subject an educator to automatic revocation of an educator license similarly subject an educator to automatic revocation of an educator license by the state board. - Amends TCA Section 49-5-417.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 49-5-417, relative to educator licensure actions taken by the state board of education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Effective date(s) 03/15/2024 | |
2024-03-26 | Pub. Ch. 577 | |
2024-03-15 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-03-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-05 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-27 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-02-26 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-02-22 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/26/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/22/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 2/14/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2024-02-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/6/2024 |
2024-01-11 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-01-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2024-01-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1701 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 577