TN HB1785 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each applicant be at least 18 years of age before a county clerk can issue a marriage license. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3 and Title 37, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, requires each applicant be at least 18 years of age before a county clerk can issue a marriage license. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3 and Title 37, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2018-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2018-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1790 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-27 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee