TN HB1783 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 827
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 827
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, generally establishes that permanent rules filed in the office of the secretary of state on or after January 1, 2023, that are in effect on May 1, 2024, and that are scheduled for expiration on June 30, 2024, do not expire on June 30, 2024, but remain in effect until repealed or amended by subsequent rule of the appropriate rulemaking agency or until otherwise superseded by legislative enactment. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT relative to agency rules scheduled to expire pursuant to the provisions of the Uniform Administrative Procedures Act, compiled in Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 827 | |
2024-04-15 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2024-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-04 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2024-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-25 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/25/2024 |
2024-01-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2024-01-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1640 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Effective date(s) 05/01/2024