TN HB1769 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends the state board for licensing contractors to June 30, 2026; revises minimum attendance requirement for board members and requires removal of members who do not meet the requirement. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 62, Chapter 6, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, extends the state board for licensing contractors to June 30, 2026; revises minimum attendance requirement for board members and requires removal of members who do not meet the requirement. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 62, Chapter 6, Part 1.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-02-19HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/24/2020
2020-01-23HouseP2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
2020-01-22HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-01-21HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1691 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback