TN HB1763 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands the definition of drug paraphernalia to include pill press devices and pieces of a pill press device, unless the pill press device or piece is used by a person or entity that lawfully possesses drug products in the course of legitimate business activities, including a pharmacy or pharmacist licensed by the board of pharmacy; a wholesale drug distributor, or its agents, licensed by the board of pharmacy; and a manufacturer of drug products, or its agents, licensed by the board of pharmacy. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4 and Title 63.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4 and Title 63, relative to drug paraphernalia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2022 | |
2022-04-13 | Pub. Ch. 804 | |
2022-04-08 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-03-31 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-25 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0645) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-24 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-02-24 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 80, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2022-02-24 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0501) |
2022-02-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/24/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/17/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-02 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/9/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/2/2022 |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2022-01-20 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-18 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1802 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 804