TN HB1763 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 794
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 794
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing contracts for construction. - Amends TCA Section 12-4-107.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing contracts for construction. - Amends TCA Section 12-4-107.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 794 | |
2018-04-09 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/5/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2501 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 794