TN HB1754 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 243
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 243
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies provisions regarding additional information and follow-up utilization review for outpatient mental health and chemical dependency patients; specifies that exemptions from the utilization review standards for certain agents do not apply to the standards for outpatient mental health and chemical dependency care. - Amends TCA Section 56-6-705.
Title
As enacted, clarifies provisions regarding additional information and follow-up utilization review for outpatient mental health and chemical dependency patients; specifies that exemptions from the utilization review standards for certain agents do not apply to the standards for outpatient mental health and chemical dependency care. - Amends TCA Section 56-6-705.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Commerce Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Commerce Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 243 | |
2011-05-11 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2011-05-05 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/11/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/5/2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 5/3/2011 | |
2011-04-26 | Action Def. in Commerce Committee to 5/3/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on s/c cal Commerce Subcommittee for 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Action Def. in s/c Commerce Subcommittee to 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on s/c cal Commerce Subcommittee for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Action Def. in s/c Commerce Subcommittee to 4/13/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on s/c cal Commerce Subcommittee for 4/6/2011 | |
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Commerce | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2011-02-23 | P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1988 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-25 - Pub. Ch. 243