TN HB1748 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 544
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, extends the dyslexia advisory council to June 30, 2027. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, extends the dyslexia advisory council to June 30, 2027. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 544
2020-03-02HouseComp. SB subst.
2020-02-27HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/2/2020
2020-02-26HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/27/2020
2020-02-03HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-01-29HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/3/2020
2020-01-23HouseP2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
2020-01-22HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-01-21HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1670 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 544

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback