TN SB1670 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 544
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, extends the dyslexia advisory council to June 30, 2027. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, extends the dyslexia advisory council to June 30, 2027. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26 Pub. Ch. 544
2020-03-26 Effective date(s) 03/19/2020
2020-03-19SenateSigned by Governor.
2020-03-10SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2020-03-10HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2020-03-09SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2020-03-05SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2020-03-02HousePassed H., Ayes 99, Nays 0, PNV 0
2020-03-02HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2020-02-27HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2020-02-25SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2020-02-24SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2020-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/24/2020
2020-02-19SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2020-02-12SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/19/2020
2020-01-23SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2020-01-22SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-01-16SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1748 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 544

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback