TN HB1738 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 638
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 638
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the committee for clinical perfusionists to June 30, 2026. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 63, Chapter 28.
Title
As enacted, extends the committee for clinical perfusionists to June 30, 2026. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 63, Chapter 28.
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Daniel [R] | Rep. Bill Dunn [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 638 | |
2020-03-19 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-03-18 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1660 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 638