TN HB1736 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits governmental entities from denying access to records available for public inspection because a governmental entity is involved in civil litigation or a criminal proceeding or contemplating involvement in civil litigation or a criminal proceeding, provided that such records were in existence and available for public inspection prior to initiation or contemplation of the litigation or proceeding. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, prohibits governmental entities from denying access to records available for public inspection because a governmental entity is involved in civil litigation or a criminal proceeding or contemplating involvement in civil litigation or a criminal proceeding, provided that such records were in existence and available for public inspection prior to initiation or contemplation of the litigation or proceeding. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State & Local Government Commit (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Action Def. in s/c S&LG Subcommittee to 4/13/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 4/6/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Action Def. in s/c S&LG Subcommittee to 4/6/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 3/30/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Action Def. in s/c S&LG Subcommittee to 3/30/2011 | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 3/16/2011 | |
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-02-23 | P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1604 (Crossfiled) 2011-02-24 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.