TN HB1735 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 693
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 693
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, directs TACIR to study how to make nontax-producing property held by state and local governments productive. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, directs TACIR to study how to make nontax-producing property held by state and local governments productive. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Pub. Ch. 693 | |
2018-04-17 | Effective date(s) 04/09/2018 | |
2018-04-09 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-03-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-03-06 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-03-05 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2018-03-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-01 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/5/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/1/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2018-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-22 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2650 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 693