TN HB1730 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-06 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-06 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires all written driver license examinations to be administered in English only; prohibits use of a translation dictionary, electronic device, or interpreter to assist with the examination. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50, Part 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, Chapter 50, Part 3, relative to the issuance of driver licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2024-01-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2024-01-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1717 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee