TN HB1718 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes retirement credit for Tennessee consolidated retirement system members who are honorably discharged veterans of the United States armed forces. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35 and Title 8, Chapter 36.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35 and Title 8, Chapter 36, relative to military service credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2022-01-19 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1750 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-19 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee