TN HB1717 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 765
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 765
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions regarding the delivery of alcoholic beverages, including the fee structure for delivery service licenses. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 3 and Title 57, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions regarding the delivery of alcoholic beverages, including the fee structure for delivery service licenses. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 3 and Title 57, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 72 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Pub. Ch. 765 | |
2018-04-23 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2018 | |
2018-04-19 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-05 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-05 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 72, Nays 11 PNV 4 HB1717 |
2018-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/5/2018 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 3, PNV 1 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0920) |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-03-15 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-03-15 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 68, Nays 18, PNV 7 |
2018-03-15 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0698) |
2018-03-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/15/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/8/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-02-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-22 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1597 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 765