TN HB1715 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 717
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 717
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands the locations a manufacturer may possess, store, and transport its products to include any county that has authorized the manufacture of alcoholic beverages and any county adjacent to such county; authorizes the storage of the manufacturer's products in facilities authorized or leased by the manufacturer. - Amends TCA Section 57-2-104.
Title
As enacted, expands the locations a manufacturer may possess, store, and transport its products to include any county that has authorized the manufacture of alcoholic beverages and any county adjacent to such county; authorizes the storage of the manufacturer's products in facilities authorized or leased by the manufacturer. - Amends TCA Section 57-2-104.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 717 | |
2018-03-22 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/22/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/15/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-19 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1814 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 717