TN HB1708 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a victim of a crime be notified when a defendant is scheduled to be transferred to a correctional complex with lower security designation instead of after the defendant is transferred. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 38, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, requires a victim of a crime be notified when a defendant is scheduled to be transferred to a correctional complex with lower security designation instead of after the defendant is transferred. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 38, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Withdrawn. |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2018-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-18 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1644 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee