TN HB1691 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes the requirement that retired law enforcement officers who are authorized to carry handguns undergo an additional criminal history background check upon recertification. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 8, Part 1 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As introduced, removes the requirement that retired law enforcement officers who are authorized to carry handguns undergo an additional criminal history background check upon recertification. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 8, Part 1 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2014-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1802 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-18 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1691&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1691.pdf |