TN HB1686 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-8)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 751
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, specifies that, for the 2017-2018 school year, employment termination and compensation decisions for pre-kindergarten or kindergarten teachers will not be based solely on data generated by the portfolio model; revises provisions regarding funding and approval for LEAs. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, specifies that, for the 2017-2018 school year, employment termination and compensation decisions for pre-kindergarten or kindergarten teachers will not be based solely on data generated by the portfolio model; revises provisions regarding funding and approval for LEAs. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23 Pub. Ch. 751
2018-04-23 Effective date(s) 04/18/2018
2018-04-18 Signed by Governor.
2018-04-06HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2018-04-05SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-04HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-03HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2018-04-02SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2018-04-02SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0892)
2018-04-02SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2018-03-22SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2018-03-20HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2018-03-19HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-19HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-03-19HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0870)
2018-03-15HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2018
2018-03-14HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/15/2018
2018-03-13HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-03-07HousePlaced on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 3/13/2018
2018-02-27HouseAction def. in Education Instruction & Programs to 3/13/2018
2018-02-22HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-21HousePlaced on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 2/27/2018
2018-02-20HouseAction def. in Education Instruction & Programs to 2/27/2018
2018-02-14HousePlaced on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 2/20/2018
2018-02-14HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
2018-02-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 2/14/2018
2018-01-29HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-01-24HouseAssigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee
2018-01-24HouseP2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
2018-01-22HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-18HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1854 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 751

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback