TN HB1686 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides that a civil judgment or restitution order converted to civil judgment is valid until paid in full rather than renewed every 10 years if the judgment is based upon injury or death caused by criminal conduct and the judgment debtor was convicted of a criminal offense for such conduct. - Amends TCA Title 28, Chapter 3, Part 1 and Title 40, Chapter 35, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, provides that a civil judgment or restitution order converted to civil judgment is valid until paid in full rather than renewed every 10 years if the judgment is based upon injury or death caused by criminal conduct and the judgment debtor was convicted of a criminal offense for such conduct. - Amends TCA Title 28, Chapter 3, Part 1 and Title 40, Chapter 35, Part 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Civil Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Civil Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 596 |
2014-03-06 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-03-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/6/2014 |
2014-03-03 | House | Reset on Next Available Regular cal. |
2014-02-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/3/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/27/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/26/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | Action Def. in Civil Justice Committee to 2/26/2014 |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/19/2014 |
2014-02-12 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/12/2014 |
2014-01-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2014-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-17 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1953 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 596