TN HB1672 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Instruction & Programs
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Instruction & Programs
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a pilot program to provide grants to elementary and middle schools to implement the Leader in Me® pilot program. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, creates a pilot program to provide grants to elementary and middle schools to implement the Leader in Me® pilot program. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 2.
Sponsors
Rep. David Byrd [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Sheila Butt [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Rep. Barry Doss [R] | Rep. Harry Brooks [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] |
Rep. Jim Coley [R] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. John Forgety [R] |
Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] | Rep. John DeBerry [D] | Rep. Jimmy Matlock [R] | Rep. Billy Spivey [R] |
Rep. Steve McDaniel [R] | Rep. Craig Fitzhugh [D] | Rep. Kevin Dunlap [D] | Rep. Courtney Rogers [R] |
Rep. Timothy Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Education Instruction & Programs |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-16 | House | Action def. in Education Instruction & Programs to 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 2/16/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 2/10/2016 |
2016-02-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2016-01-20 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2016-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-13 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1732 (Crossfiled) 2016-01-21 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1672&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1672.pdf |