TN HB1672 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that there are circumstances in which a firearm can be carried in a public park and clarifies that it is firearms, clubs and knives that are prohibited in parks and not weapons already regulated such as machine guns and explosive weapons. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13; Title 40, Chapter 14; Title 40, Chapter 35; Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 34 and Title 70.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that there are circumstances in which a firearm can be carried in a public park and clarifies that it is firearms, clubs and knives that are prohibited in parks and not weapons already regulated such as machine guns and explosive weapons. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13; Title 40, Chapter 14; Title 40, Chapter 35; Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 34 and Title 70.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Judiciary | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-23 | P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1754 (Crossfiled) 2011-02-24 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1672&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB1672.pdf |