TN HB1671 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 603
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 603
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing the assigning of a student to an alternative school or alternative program. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing the assigning of a student to an alternative school or alternative program. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Johnny Garrett [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] |
Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Chris Hurt [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 603 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-03-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/5/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 2/12/2020 |
2020-02-05 | House | Action def. in Education to 2/12/2020 |
2020-01-29 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 2/5/2020 |
2020-01-28 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education |
2020-01-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 1/28/2020 |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2020-01-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-01-16 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1755 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 603