TN HB1647 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Passed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 520
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Passed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 520
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows the court to approve agreements pertaining to custody and residential parenting schedules without making further inquiry and an independent determination that the modification is in the best interest of the child, if the parties announce an agreement to the court on the record or execute a permanent parenting plan approved through entry of an agreed order. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 4 and Title 36, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, allows the court to approve agreements pertaining to custody and residential parenting schedules without making further inquiry and an independent determination that the modification is in the best interest of the child, if the parties announce an agreement to the court on the record or execute a permanent parenting plan approved through entry of an agreed order. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 4 and Title 36, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 520 | |
2020-02-20 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-02-13 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/20/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/13/2020 |
2020-02-05 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 2/5/2020 |
2020-01-29 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2020-01-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 1/29/2020 |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee |
2020-01-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-01-16 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1618 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Pub. Ch. 520