TN HB1645 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 594
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, extends the dyslexia advisory council for two years to June 30, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, extends the dyslexia advisory council for two years to June 30, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 594
2018-03-08HouseComp. SB subst.
2018-03-01HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/8/2018
2018-02-28HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/1/2018
2018-02-07HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-01-31HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/7/2018
2018-01-24HouseP2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
2018-01-22HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-18HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1537 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 594

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback