TN SB1537 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 594
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, extends the dyslexia advisory council for two years to June 30, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, extends the dyslexia advisory council for two years to June 30, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-31 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04 Pub. Ch. 594
2018-04-04 Effective date(s) 03/22/2018
2018-03-22SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-03-13SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-03-12HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-03-12SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-03-08HousePassed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-03-08HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0673)
2018-03-08HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-03-08SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-02-08HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2018-02-07SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-02-07SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2018-02-07SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0560)
2018-02-05SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/7/2018
2018-01-31SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2018-01-24SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 1/31/2018
2018-01-17SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-01-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1645 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 594

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback