TN HB1633 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 572
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 572
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits the operation of personal watercraft without the use of a lanyard type engine cutoff switch if no lanyard was installed on the watercraft at the time of production by the manufacturer. - Amends TCA Title 69, Chapter 9, Part 5.
Title
As enacted, permits the operation of personal watercraft without the use of a lanyard type engine cutoff switch if no lanyard was installed on the watercraft at the time of production by the manufacturer. - Amends TCA Title 69, Chapter 9, Part 5.
Sponsors
Rep. Glen Casada [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 572 | |
2016-02-22 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-02-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/22/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/11/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 2/10/2016 |
2016-02-02 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/2/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2016-01-20 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2016-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-13 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1620 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-22 - Pub. Ch. 572
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1633&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1633.pdf |