TN HB1631 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that a private school serving students in any of the grades pre-K through 12 is authorized to adopt a handgun carry policy for the private school's property. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13; Title 49, Chapter 1 and Title 49, Chapter 50.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13; Title 49, Chapter 1 and Title 49, Chapter 50, relative to private schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Gino Bulso [R] | Rep. Kip Capley [R] | Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] | Rep. Jody Barrett [R] |
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Rusty Grills [R] |
Rep. Jake McCalmon [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Effective date(s) 04/22/2024 | |
2024-05-01 | Pub. Ch. 738 | |
2024-04-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-04-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-02 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 26, Nays 5 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-27 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-02-26 | House | Passed H., Ayes 74, Nays 23, PNV 0 |
2024-02-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/26/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/22/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 2/14/2024 |
2024-01-31 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Education Administration |
2024-01-24 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 1/31/2024 |
2024-01-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-23 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 1/23/2024 |
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee - Education Administration |
2024-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1708 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 738