TN HB1630 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 550
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 550
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the board of trustees of the University of Tennessee, the board of regents, each local governing board of trustees of a state university, each local board of education, and the governing body of each public charter school to adopt a policy regarding the use of artificial intelligence technology by students, faculty, and staff for instructional and assignment purposes. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to artificial intelligence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 550 | |
2024-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-22 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-02-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/22/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/15/2024 |
2024-02-12 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/12/2024 |
2024-01-31 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 1/31/2024 |
2024-01-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2024-01-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 1/23/2024 |
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration - Government Operations for Review |
2024-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1711 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Effective date(s) 03/11/2024