TN HB1628 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 255
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 255
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits the commissioner of environment and conservation from issuing a permit for the disposal of coal ash or for the expansion of an existing coal ash disposal facility unless the plans for the disposal facility include a liner and a final cap, with certain exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 211.
Title
As enacted, prohibits the commissioner of environment and conservation from issuing a permit for the disposal of coal ash or for the expansion of an existing coal ash disposal facility unless the plans for the disposal facility include a liner and a final cap, with certain exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 211.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McCord [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 255 | |
2009-04-23 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2009-04-21 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/23/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/21/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 4/14/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 03/31/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Rec. For Pass.w/ amendment by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on s/c cal State Government of S&LG for 03/25/2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to s/c State Government of S&LG | |
2009-02-23 | P2C, ref. to State & Local--Government Operations for review | |
2009-02-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1559 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 255
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1628&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1628.pdf |