TN HB1622 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pr. Ch. 26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pr. Ch. 26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, authorizes the county legislative body to implement and administer a hotel motel tax, including the collection and remittance of the tax by a hotel operator and liability of such operator for delinquent tax payments. - Amends Chapter.
Title
AN ACT relative to the levy of a privilege tax on the occupancy of lodgings and other accommodations by transients for consideration in Smith County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Pr. Ch. 26 | |
2021-05-04 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-04-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-23 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-14 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 52, Nays 23, PNV 8 |
2021-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-03-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1640 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 26