TN HB1620 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 524
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 524
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, deletes the July 1, 2024, termination date for Chapter 462 of the Public Acts of 2021, allowing a law enforcement agency to continue to use a drone to search for and collect evidence or obtain information with the consent of a private property owner, in case of a natural emergency, or to investigate a crime that is occurring or has occurred. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Chapter 462 of the Public Acts of 2021.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 13 and Chapter 462 of the Public Acts of 2021, relative to use of drones.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 524 | |
2024-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-15 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-02-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/15/2024 |
2024-02-12 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2024-02-08 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/12/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/8/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-06 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/6/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 1/30/2024 |
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-12-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1645 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-15 - Effective date(s) 03/01/2024