TN HB1612 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds exemptions to the warrant requirement for drone use by law enforcement when a drone is deployed to provide or enhance security for an event open to the public and where attendance is expected to exceed 100 persons or to investigate the scene of a crime. - Amends TCA Title 38 and Title 39, Chapter 13.
Title
As introduced, adds exemptions to the warrant requirement for drone use by law enforcement when a drone is deployed to provide or enhance security for an event open to the public and where attendance is expected to exceed 100 persons or to investigate the scene of a crime. - Amends TCA Title 38 and Title 39, Chapter 13.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2020-01-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1791 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee