TN HB1611 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "TennCare for Working Individuals with Disabilities Act." - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 71, Chapter 5, relative to TennCare.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | House | Withdrawn. |
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-11-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1611&ga=113 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/113/Bill/HB1611.pdf |