TN HB1605 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 660
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 660
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes various new special license plates and grants additional time for certain plates to meet the minimum order requirement. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Title
As enacted, authorizes various new special license plates and grants additional time for certain plates to meet the minimum order requirement. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Rep. Jason Hodges [D] | Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 660 | |
2020-03-19 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-03-19 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Action def. to Next Calendar in Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-03-18 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2020-02-25 | House | Ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-01-15 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1591 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 660