TN HB1586 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-22 - Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-22 - Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes obsolete reference to a report on certain insurance laws that was due from the commissioner of commerce and insurance on March 1, 2012. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9; Title 29 and Title 56.
Title
As introduced, removes obsolete reference to a report on certain insurance laws that was due from the commissioner of commerce and insurance on March 1, 2012. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9; Title 29 and Title 56.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Travis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2018-01-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-17 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1746 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-25 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee