TN HB1578 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates an offense for a person to possess or manufacture an ammunition feeding device that has capacity to accept more than 10 rounds, except for certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, relative to large-capacity magazines.
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. Torrey Harris [D] | Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D] |
Rep. Jason Powell [D] | Rep. Gloria Johnson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-04-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-13 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Delayed Bills Committee |
2023-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2023-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Delayed Bills Committee for 4/13/2023 |
2023-04-10 | House | Sponsor change. |
2023-04-05 | House | Ref. to Delayed Bills Committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1565 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1578&ga=113 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/113/Bill/HB1578.pdf |