TN HB1578 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires this state to refuse to consent to receive any refugees for purposes of resettlement; requires each local government within this state to refuse to consent to receive any refugees for purposes of resettlement unless resettlement within its jurisdiction is approved by a certain process. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6 and Title 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires this state to refuse to consent to receive any refugees for purposes of resettlement; requires each local government within this state to refuse to consent to receive any refugees for purposes of resettlement unless resettlement within its jurisdiction is approved by a certain process. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6 and Title 7.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-04 - House - HOUSE STATE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - HOUSE DEPARTMENTS & AGENCIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-11HouseReset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-06-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020
2020-06-04HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-06-01HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 6/4/2020
2020-05-28HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee
2020-05-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 5/28/2020
2020-03-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/17/2020
2020-03-10HouseAction Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 3/17/2020
2020-03-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/10/2020
2020-01-15HouseAssigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
2020-01-15HouseP2C, ref. to State Committee
2020-01-14HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-12-12HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1567 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-16 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback