TN HB1575 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes the authority to issue and receive concealed handgun carry permits; authorizes a person who holds a concealed handgun carry permit on June 30, 2023, to apply to convert the permit to an enhanced handgun carry permit. - Amends TCA Section 10-7-504; Section 33-6-413; Section 38-8-116; Section 39-16-702; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13 and Section 70-2-104.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 10-7-504; Section 33-6-413; Section 38-8-116; Section 39-16-702; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13 and Section 70-2-104, relative to handguns.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-04-13 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Delayed Bills Committee |
2023-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Delayed Bills Committee for 4/13/2023 |
2023-04-05 | House | Ref. to Delayed Bills Committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1568 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1575&ga=113 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/113/Bill/HB1575.pdf |