TN SB1568 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, removes the authority to issue and receive concealed handgun carry permits; authorizes a person who holds a concealed handgun carry permit on June 30, 2023, to apply to convert the permit to an enhanced handgun carry permit. - Amends TCA Section 10-7-504; Section 33-6-413; Section 38-8-116; Section 39-16-702; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13 and Section 70-2-104.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 10-7-504; Section 33-6-413; Section 38-8-116; Section 39-16-702; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13 and Section 70-2-104, relative to handguns.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2024-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2024-02-01SenateRefer to Senate Desk for Introduction
2023-04-06SenateRefer to Senate Delayed Bills Committee
2023-04-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1575 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-10 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback