TN HB1571 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides for certain reemployment rights for volunteer firefighters injured in the line of duty. - Amends TCA Title 50.
Title
As introduced, provides for certain reemployment rights for volunteer firefighters injured in the line of duty. - Amends TCA Title 50.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Withdrawn. | |
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of C&EA | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to Consumer & Employee Affairs Committee | |
2011-02-23 | P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0067 (Crossfiled) 2011-02-07 - P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1571&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB1571.pdf |