TN HB1571 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Employee Affairs of C&EA of Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Employee Affairs of C&EA of Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes officers of corporations to exempt themselves from unemployment law provisions. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, authorizes officers of corporations to exempt themselves from unemployment law provisions. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Rep. Ben West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-03 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Employee Affairs of C&EA of Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee | |
2010-01-27 | Placed on s/c cal Employee Affairs of C&EA for 02/03/2010 | |
2009-04-21 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Employee Affairs of C&EA of Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on s/c cal Employee Affairs of C&EA for 04/21/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Action Def. in s/c Employee Affairs of C&EA to 4/21/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on s/c cal Employee Affairs of C&EA for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Action Def. in s/c Employee Affairs of C&EA to 4/7/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on s/c cal Employee Affairs of C&EA for 03/31/2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Action Def. in s/c Employee Affairs of C&EA to 3/31/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on s/c cal Employee Affairs of C&EA for 03/24/2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to s/c Employee Affairs of C&EA | |
2009-02-23 | P2C, ref. to Consumer & Employee Affairs | |
2009-02-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0432 (Crossfiled) 2009-10-09 - Action def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 2010
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1571&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1571.pdf |